IA HSB28 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF152
Note: Legislation replaced by HF257
Note: Legislation replaced by HF257
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 257.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 257.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to third-party testers who administer the knowledge and driving skills tests required for a commercial learner's permit or commercial driver's license.(See HF 257.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to third-party testers who administer the knowledge and driving skills tests required for a commercial learner's permit or commercial driver's license.(See HF 257.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 257. |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 278. |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2023 12:30PM RM 304. |
2023-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Wilson and Wood. H.J. 97. |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 94. |
2023-01-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1060 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 152.
SF152 (Replaced by) 2023-03-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 513.
HF257 (Replaced by) 2023-03-22 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 732.
SF152 (Replaced by) 2023-03-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 513.
HF257 (Replaced by) 2023-03-22 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 732.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB28 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB28.html |