IA HF2516 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2703.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2703.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to work-based learning, including by repealing provisions related to regional industry sector partnerships and the statewide work-based learning intermediary network, establishing the workforce opportunity fund within the department of workforce development, modifying provisions related to career and technical education, student teacher requirements for students with substitute teaching or para-educator experience, and the future ready Iowa skilled workforce last-dollar scholarship program, and making appropriations.(Formerly HSB 686; See HF 2703.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to work-based learning, including by repealing provisions related to regional industry sector partnerships and the statewide work-based learning intermediary network, establishing the workforce opportunity fund within the department of workforce development, modifying provisions related to career and technical education, student teacher requirements for students with substitute teaching or para-educator experience, and the future ready Iowa skilled workforce last-dollar scholarship program, and making appropriations.(Formerly HSB 686; See HF 2703.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2703. |
2024-04-17 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 04/17. |
2024-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2024 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2024-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Amos Jr. and Collins. H.J. 382. |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 266. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB686 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2516.
HF2703 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 906.
HF2703 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 906.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2516 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2516.html |