HI SB2119 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes out-of-state pharmacies to transfer prescription information for the initial fill of an out-of-state prescription in the State. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Out-of-state Prescriptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 31-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 31-24). |
2024-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Nakashima, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-24 3:45PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Awa. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Sayama Chair; Nakashima, Tam, Pierick. |
2024-04-02 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 355). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 496). |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1556-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-13-24 2:05PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 31). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2771) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-24 9:35AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2475) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 1:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to HHS, CPN. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1825 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to HHS, CPN.