HI HB65 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB65
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a tax clearance before a professional or vocational license may be issued or renewed. Requires the departments of taxation and commerce and consumer affairs to jointly implement a procedure or system for processing and issuing tax clearances. Effective 1/1/2050. Applies to taxable years after 12/31/2022. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 240) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB65 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).