HI HB1529 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows any burial council member whose term has expired to continue in office as a holdover member until the member's reappointment to a second term is confirmed or a successor is nominated and appointed. Prohibits holdover members from holding office beyond the end of the fourth regular session of the legislature following the expiration of the member's term of office. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Burial Councils.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782). |
2024-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia excused (2). |
2024-04-18 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 771). |
2024-04-18 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 494) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3685) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 04-02-24 10:01AM; CR 016. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-27-24 9:45AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3105) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-12-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 179). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Souza voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 895-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souza; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama, Evslin. |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 240-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souza; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled. |