HI HB1196 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an audit of contracts with DHS to provide QUEST expanded access QExA managed care plans to cover eligible individuals who are aged, blind, or disabled with regard to late payments to health care providers.
Title
DHS; Auditor; QExA
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-12-15 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1196&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1196_.HTM |