GA SB584 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for new homestead exemptions from City of Stockbridge ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes for residents, certain seniors, and residents with septic systems; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemptions and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Stockbridge; new homestead exemptions; ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes for residents, certain seniors, and residents with septic systems; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #832 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #712 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #712 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-21 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |