GA SB189 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide that the text portions of ballots produced by ballot marking devices shall be counted for vote tabulation and recounts purposes instead of any machine coding; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; text portions of ballots shall be counted for vote tabulation and recounts purposes; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Max Burns [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] |
Sen. Colton Moore [R] | Sen. Clint Dixon [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Marty Harbin [R] |
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Russ Goodman [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Rep. John LaHood [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #894 (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - Senate - Motion For The Previous Question: Senate Vote #893 (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #866 (Y: 101 N: 73 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #472 (Y: 31 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 189, Sb 344: Senate Vote #467 (Y: 30 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - Senate - Motion For The Previous Question: Senate Vote #893 (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #866 (Y: 101 N: 73 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #472 (Y: 31 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 189, Sb 344: Senate Vote #467 (Y: 30 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |