GA HB3 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 14 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to other educational programs, so as to provide sanctions for persons that enter into or solicit a transaction with a student-athlete that would result in sanctions to the student-athlete; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; programs; person solicit transaction with student-athlete; provide sanctions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #299 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #261 (Y: 145 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #261 (Y: 145 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 101 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-26 | House | House Hopper |
2014-11-17 | House | House Prefiled |