DE SB94 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill adds to current tanning bed restrictions by banning all minors from using tanning devices in tanning facilities. It also mandates warning signs and statements in tanning facilities.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Tanning Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 12 On Its Merits |
2014-05-14 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |