DE SB46 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This act would authorize physicians licensed in other states and countries who travel with out-of-state sports teams to Delaware for sporting events to provide medical care to those teams, coaches, and their families during those events. By doing so, it will help traveling athletes receive care from physicians they know and have been treated by in the past. Such visiting physicians would be prohibited from providing medical care to any other person residing in or present in Delaware except in an emergency. This temporary exemption from licensure for visiting team physicians would not authorize that person to practice medicine in a hospital or other health care facility, and it would be limited to ten days per sporting event unless extended by the Executive Director of the Board of Medical Licensure and Discipline.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relation To The Medical Practice Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-07-01 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2013-05-15 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |