DE HB368 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides environmental cleanup liability protections for lenders who foreclose on properties that contain aboveground storage tanks and sets forth the criteria and process for lenders to maintain this liability protection. This Act also corrects an omission that occurred when House Bill 95, as amended by Amendment 2, was passed last Legislative session on June 27, 2013 relating to specifying a timeframe for the Department Of Natural Resources and Environmental Control to file an environmental lien with the Recorder of Deeds.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Aboveground Storage Tanks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |
2014-06-17 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits |
2014-05-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |