DE HB14 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates a new license for the use of trotlines in commercial crabbing. This Act prohibits a person from possessing a commercial crab pot license and trotline license at the same time.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Trotline Licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. William Carson [D] | Sen. Kyra Hoffner [D] | Rep. William Bush [D] | Rep. Ronald Gray [R] |
Rep. Jeff Hilovsky [R] | Rep. Sophie Phillips [D] | Rep. Daniel Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2024-04-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2024-04-16 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 14 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2024-03-28 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 14 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-03-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 6 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-02-29 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House |