DE HB133 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would allow drivers of a vehicle to make a left turn across a paved dividing space unless prohibited by an official traffic-control device. This language is consistent with the National Uniform Vehicle Code permitting the crossing of flushed or painted paved medians. This will allow drivers to traverse the median to gain access to driveways across from the other lane.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Rules Of The Road.
Sponsors
Rep. William Carson [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] | Rep. Andria Bennett [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] |
Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |
2013-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2013-05-14 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |