DC B20-0118 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on November 22 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-11-22 - Law L20-0036 Effective from Nov 5, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 16021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Marriage Officiant Amendment Act Of 2013

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage Officiant Amendment Act Of 2013

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-07-10 - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - 1st Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-22CouncilLaw L20-0036 Effective from Nov 5, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 16021
2013-09-09CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Oct 22, 2013
2013-08-23CouncilAct A20-0152 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 12143
2013-08-06CouncilReturned from Mayor
2013-07-24CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 7, 2013
2013-07-10CouncilFinal Reading
2013-06-26Council1st Reading
2013-06-06CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B20-0118
2013-03-14CouncilPublic Hearing on B20-0118
2013-02-15CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B20-0118 Published in the District of Columbia Register
2013-02-05CouncilB20-0118 Introduced by Councilmembers Barry, Catania, Evans, Graham, Grosso, Wells, and Cheh at Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback