CT SB00981 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a special motion to dismiss in civil proceedings involving a strategic lawsuit against public participation.
Title
An Act Concerning Strategic Litigation Against Public Participation And A Special Motion To Dismiss.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 341 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 279 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 279 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Public Act 17-71 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 646 |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-06-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7089 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | File Number 675 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 357 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/27 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |