CT SB00957 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) regulate the operation of a casino gaming facility in Connecticut, and (2) authorize MMCT Venture, LLC, to operate a casino gaming facility in Connecticut subject to certain conditions.
Title
An Act Concerning The Regulation Of Gaming And The Authorization Of A Casino Gaming Facility In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 363 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 59 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 364 AS AMENDED (Y: 103 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 166 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7686 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 167 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 7707 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 168 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 364 AS AMENDED (Y: 103 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 166 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7686 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 167 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 7707 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 168 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Public Act 17-89 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7963 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8189 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 569 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule C 7673 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7707 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7686 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | File Number 310 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 173 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |