CT SB00313 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a pilot program to authorize individual, not-for-profit farmers who engage in the cooperative retail marketing of Connecticut-grown farm products to participate as vendors in both the Connecticut Farmers' Market/Women, Infants and Children Program and the Connecticut Farmers' Market/Senior Nutrition Program.
Title
An Act Concerning Participation In Wic And Senior Nutrition Farmers' Market Programs By Certain Nonprofit Farmers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 188 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 86 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 86 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Special Act 14-3 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-01 | Senate | House Passed |
2014-04-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 327 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | File Number 229 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 171 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |