CT HB07104 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To no longer permit suppliers and electric distribution companies to make up renewable energy portfolio deficiencies within the first three months of the succeeding calendar year.
Title
An Act Concerning Renewable Portfolio Standard Compliance Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 377 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 78 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 78 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-26 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-26 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-20 | House | Public Act 17-186 |
2017-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed |
2017-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 367 |
2017-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | House Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | File Number 355 |
2017-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 267 |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |