CT HB05596 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making Adjustments To State Expenditures And Revenues For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2015.
Title
An Act Making Adjustments To State Expenditures And Revenues For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 299 PASS EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 241 AS AMENDED (Y: 90 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 240 AS AMENDED HOUSE AMD B (Y: 49 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 239 EMERGENCY CERTIFI HOUSE AMD A (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 238 QUORUM CALL (Y: 72 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2014-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 241 AS AMENDED (Y: 90 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 240 AS AMENDED HOUSE AMD B (Y: 49 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 239 EMERGENCY CERTIFI HOUSE AMD A (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 238 QUORUM CALL (Y: 72 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-08 | House | Public Act 14-47 |
2014-05-03 | House | In Concurrence |
2014-05-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-03 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 5208 |
2014-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5271 |
2014-05-02 | House | Emergency Certification |