CO SB155 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the state board of accountancy, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2018 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Accountancy Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-155 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-155 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-155 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-155 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-155 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-155 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-155, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-19 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-17 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |