CO SB081 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to increase protections from perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals.
Title
Perfluoroalkyl & Polyfluoroalkyl Chemicals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Prev ? (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-081, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.021 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-081, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-081, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-081, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Prev ? (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-081, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.021 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-081, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-081, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-081, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-09 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |