CO HJR1012 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Minimum Wage Increase
Title
Federal Minimum Wage Increase
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-03-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-03-12 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |