CO HB1463 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning restrictions on the authority of a special district to set fees on developments.
Title
Restrictions on Tap Fees
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Hartsook [R] | Rep. Chris Kennedy [D] | Sen. Chris Hansen [D] | Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R] |
Rep. Shannon Bird [D] | Rep. Monica Duran [D] | Rep. Meg Froelich [D] | Rep. Tammy Story [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1463 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1463, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment K) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1463, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1463, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment K) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1463, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2024-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-30 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |