CA SJR15 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Harbor Maintenance Tax.
Title
Harbor Maintenance Tax: Harbor Maintenance Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - Senate - Special Consent #14 SJR15 DeSaulnier (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - SJR 15 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SJR15 DeSaulnier (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - SJR 15 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SJR15 DeSaulnier (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-06 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |
2012-07-02 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4222.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-06-25 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-06-25 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5418.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-12 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). | |
2012-06-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-04-12 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-04-12 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3130.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-03-29 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-03-28 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3035.) (March 28). | |
2012-03-02 | Set for hearing March 27. | |
2012-01-04 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-09-07 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |