CA SB997 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18724 of, and to add and repeal Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 18725) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Voluntary contributions: California Fund for Senior
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB997 Morrell Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 997 Morrell Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Special Consent #13 SB997 Morrell (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 997 Morrell Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Special Consent #13 SB997 Morrell (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4401.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5913.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3417.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3256.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18724 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18725 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23663 | Amended Code | Citation Text |