CA SB991 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 261, 261.6, 264, and 290 of the Penal Code, relating to sex offenses.
Title
Sex offenses: second degree rape.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 261 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 261.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 264 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_991&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0951-1000/sb_991_bill_20140212_introduced.html |