CA SB97 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1240, 1622, 2574, 2575, 2576, 8150.5, 8151, 8152, 8154, 8155, 35736.5, 41365, 41367, 42127, 42238.01, 42238.02, 42238.025, 42238.03, 42238.05, 42238.20, 42283, 42284, 42285, 42287, 46200, 46201, 46202, 46208, 47612, 47614.5, 47631, 48664, 49085, 52060, 52061, 52062, 52064, 52066, 52068, 52070, 52070.5, 52074, 56836.11, 70022, and 84321.6 of, to amend and repeal Sections 2558 and 47633 of, to add Section 41329.575 to, and to repeal Sections 1982, 42285.5, and 48667 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 17581.7 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 26225, 26233, and 26235 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Section 115 of Chapter 47 of the Statutes of 2013, to amend Section 83 of Chapter 48 of the Statutes of 2013, and to amend Items 6110-001-0001 and 6110-280-0001 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2013, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
School finance: local control funding formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - SB 97 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 2 SB97 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB97 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 2 SB97 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB97 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2417.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2372.) Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 2372.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3294.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2941.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 10.) (August 29). |
2013-08-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 898.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |