CA SB940 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Set for hearing April 30.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in 1021 O Street, Room 2100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Set for hearing April 30.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in 1021 O Street, Room 2100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 10.1 (commencing with Section 6173) to Chapter 4 of Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, to add Sections 1799.208 and 1799.209 to the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 1281.9 and 1283.05 of, to add Sections 1281.65 and 1281.93 to, and to repeal Section 1283.1 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil disputes.
Title
Civil disputes.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6173 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1281.65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1281.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1281.93 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1283.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1283.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1799.208 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1799.209 | New Code | See Bill Text |