CA SB663 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 33670, 34172, and 34183 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 95.6 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Local government: redevelopment: revenues from property tax override rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB663 Lara (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB663 Lara (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5645.) |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2668.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2645.) (January 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2591.) (January 14). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1385 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 33670 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1048.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13515.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13519.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 261 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 286 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 288 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 289 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 95.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 95.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |