CA SB615 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Article 3 (commencing with Section 42450.5) of Chapter 8 of Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Vehicle traction batteries.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB615 Allen et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Assembly | June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1303.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1177.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 903.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 572.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and TRANS. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42450.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |