CA SB61 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - Stricken from Senate file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - Stricken from Senate file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the Budget Act of 2009.
Title
Budget Act of 2009.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2009-05-21 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB61 Committee on B. & F.R. (Ducheny) Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - SB 61 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB61 Committee on B. & F.R. (Ducheny) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - SB 61 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB61 Committee on B. & F.R. (Ducheny) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Stricken from Senate file. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 0. Noes 36. Page 976.) Joint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29.5 suspended in the Senate. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 977.) Joint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29 suspended in the Assembly. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1610.) Senate appoints Conference Committee: Senators Ducheny, Leno, Lowenthal, Dutton, and Walters. Assembly appoints Conference Committee: Assembly Membe | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 3. Page 1610.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | Unanimous consent granted to consider without reference to committee or file. Read second time. Amended. Placed on third reading. | |
2009-04-16 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-04-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 508.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-01 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |
2009-01-29 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-01-22 | Read first time. | |
2009-01-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |
2009-01-20 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |