CA SB502 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10504.5 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
University of California: bidding requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB502 Block Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 502 Block Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB502 Block (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 502 Block Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB502 Block (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4641.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 6153.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 2). |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-08-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 948.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 787.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10504.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |