CA SB260 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 16 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 312, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3041, 3046, and 4801 of, and to add Section 3051 to, the Penal Code, relating to parole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth offender parole hearings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-10 - Unfinished Business SB260 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - SB 260 Hancock Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate 3rd Reading SB260 Hancock (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 312, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-16 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m.
2013-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2279.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-09-06SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2013-09-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 2958.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
2013-08-14AssemblySet, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-08-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1113.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-24SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1009.) (May 23).
2013-05-17SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2013-04-22SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2013-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 468.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2013-03-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-03-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2013-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1170.195New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code3041Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3046Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3051New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code3051.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code4801Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_260&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130213_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130318_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130404_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130524_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130627_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130213_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130318_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130404_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130524_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130627_amended_asm_v95.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130812_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130903_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130911_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_bill_20130916_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_vote_20130409_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_vote_20130422_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_vote_20130523_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_vote_20130528_0541PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_vote_20130702_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_vote_20130830_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_vote_20130906_0300PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_260_vote_20130910_0133PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback