CA SB173 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18901.11 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
CalFresh: postsecondary student eligibility: workstudy.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB173 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-05 - Assembly - SB 173 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB173 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-05 - Assembly - SB 173 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB173 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1991.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2548.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 743.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 332.) (March 11). |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 11. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18901.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |