CA SB1470 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - April 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - April 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 895, 896, 897, 916, 921, 926, 927, 933, 934, and 945.5 of the Civil Code, relating to construction defects.
Title
Construction defect cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | April 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 895 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 896 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 897 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 916 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 927 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 933 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 934 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 945.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |