CA SB1340 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12993 of, and to add Article 1.1 (commencing with Section 12978) to Chapter 7 of Part 2.8 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, and to add Sections 6990.2 and 6990.3 to the Public Contract Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L., P.E. & R. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12978 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12993 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 6990.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 6990.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |