CA SB1156 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 87200.5 to the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Groundwater sustainability agencies: conflicts of interest: financial interest disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1156 Hurtado (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | From consent calendar on motion of Senator Blakespear. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | April 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3630.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3532.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16 in E. & C.A. pending receipt. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E. & C.A. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 87200.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |