CA SB1088 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8586.10 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Office of Emergency Services: state matching funds: water system infrastructure improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3528.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and N.R. & W. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8586.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |