CA SB1070 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19050.8 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State civil service: temporary assignments or loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1070 Padilla et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3757.) (April 24). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19050.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |