CA ACR168 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Native Americans.
Title
Native Americans: NFL Football: Change the Mascot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR168 Alejo By Correa (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - ACR 168 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - ACR 168 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 4896.) |
2014-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 4. Page 6116.) |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 13). |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5962.) |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2014-08-05 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |