CA ACR151 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-17)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-17)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Diffuse Intrinsic Pontine Glioma (DIPG) Awareness Week.
Title
Diffuse Intrinsic Pontine Glioma (DIPG) Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent #18 ACR151 Wilk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-07-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4257.) |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5492.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |