CA ACR149 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-19)
Status: Passed on September 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-19)
Status: Passed on September 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to School Attendance Awareness Month.
Title
School Attendance Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR149 Weber By Lara (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4558.) |
2014-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5902.) |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |