CA ACR140 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-21)
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-21)
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 60th Anniversary of Brown v. Board of Education.
Title
60th Anniversary of Brown v. Board of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR140 Weber By Mitchell (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - ACR 140 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - ACR 140 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-09 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Page 6483.). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4824.) |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4934.) |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |