CA ACR100 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to relations with El Salvador.
Title
Relations with El Salvador.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - ACR 100 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR100 Alejo By Corbett (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Assembly - ACR 100 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR100 Alejo By Corbett (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Assembly - ACR 100 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6640.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4916.) |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 5610.) |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-06-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Amended. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Amended. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |