CA ACA6 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-27 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-27 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 4 of Article XVIII thereof, relating to constitutional amendments.
Title
Constitutional amendments: voter approval.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] | Asm. Jeff Gorell [R] | Sen. Melissa Melendez [R] |
Asm. Brian Nestande [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Assembly - ACA6 GATTO Assembly Third Reading Amend By GATTO Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 5806.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel PĂ©rez. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Atkins. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and APPR. |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |