CA AB919 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6018.2 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Sales and use taxes: veterans: itinerant vendors: repayment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 919 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB919 Williams By Jackson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Assembly - AB 919 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB919 Williams By Jackson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Assembly - AB 919 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6359.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4725.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 3738.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3741.) |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3717.) |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6018.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |