CA AB640 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 49160 and 49163 of, and to add Section 49163.1 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil work permits.
Title
Pupil work permits.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and L. & E. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49163 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49163.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |