CA AB609 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 13989) of Part 4.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to public health.
Title
State-funded research: State Department of Public Health.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Nestande [R] | Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Asm. Beth Gaines [R] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] |
Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 609 NESTANDE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB609 Nestande By Hill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 609 NESTANDE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB609 Nestande By Hill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 609 NESTANDE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6097.). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4455.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 7. Page 1814.) |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13989 | New Code | See Bill Text |