CA AB4 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14007.8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 4 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 4 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1714.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14007.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |